MD SB138 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Governor to include the State as a member of the U.S. Climate Alliance on or before July 1, 2018; prohibiting the Governor from withdrawing the State from the U.S. Climate Alliance unless the General Assembly enacts a law approving the withdrawal; and requiring the Governor to report to certain committees of the General Assembly on or before December 1 each year, beginning on or before December 1, 2018, on any collaborations among Alliance members and any policies or programs that the Alliance has endorsed or undertaken.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Environment - U.S. Climate Alliance - Membership

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (95-33) (Y: 96 N: 34 NV: 10 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (36-10) (Y: 37 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25SenateVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
2018-04-09SenateReturned Passed
2018-04-06HouseThird Reading Passed (95-33)
2018-04-05HouseSecond Reading Passed
2018-04-05HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2018-04-05HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2018-02-13HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2018-02-12SenateThird Reading Passed (36-10)
2018-02-08SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-02-08SenateFloor Amendment {883728/1 (Senator Madaleno) Adopted
2018-02-08SenateFavorable with Amendments Report Adopted
2018-02-06SenateSpecial Order until 2/8 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
2018-02-06SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2018-02-06SenateFavorable with Amendments {184134/1
2018-02-05SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-01-25SenateHearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-12SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0138&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb0138f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb0138t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0138_18413401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0138_88372801.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0016.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0008/sb0138.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/sb0138_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0210.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/sb0138_env.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1208.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/veto_letters/sb0138.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback