MD SB137 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 65
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Exempting a high-deductible health plan from the prohibition on application of a deductible to coverage for male sterilization; requiring the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to forward a certain notice of determination within 5 days of receiving the notice to the Department of Legislative Services; and providing for the termination of the Act under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Insurance - Coverage for Male Sterilization - High-Deductible Health Plans

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-10SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 65
2018-04-09SenateReturned Passed
2018-03-28HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2018-03-27HouseSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-27HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-26HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2018-03-22HouseHearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-28HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations
2018-02-27SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2018-02-23SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-02-23SenateFavorable with Amendments {607377/1 Report Adopted
2018-02-22SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2018-01-31SenateHearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
2018-01-12SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback