MD SB136 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 288
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing certain records of a corporation to be maintained by means of any information storage device, method, or electronic network or database, including a distributed electronic network or database, under certain circumstances; requiring a corporation to convert a record maintained in a certain manner into a clearly legible written form on the request of any person entitled to inspect the records; authorizing certain communications, consents, and requests to be made by means of a certain electronic transmission; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Corporations - Corporate Records and Electronic Transmission

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 288
2019-04-05SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed (134-0)
2019-04-03HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-03HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-03HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2019-02-26HouseHearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters
2019-02-07SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-02-05SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-02-05SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-02-04SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-01-22SenateHearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
2019-01-21SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback