MD SB136 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-15 - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Lee)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-15 - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Lee)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a political subdivision from adopting or enforcing a regulation or an ordinance that imposes specified additional penalties for a parking violation within 30 days after the issuance of the citation.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Parking Violations - Authority of Political Subdivisions
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Lee [D] | Sen. William Smith [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-15 | Senate | Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Lee) |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {628570/1 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Special Order until 2/15 (Senator Lee) Adopted |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {628570/1 Judicial Proceedings |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Ferguson) Adopted |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {628570/1 |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-16 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Citations
Counties
Fees
Laws and Ordinances
Local Government - Generally
Municipal Corporations
Parking
Penalties and Sentences
Rules and Regulations
Time
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous
Counties
Fees
Laws and Ordinances
Local Government - Generally
Municipal Corporations
Parking
Penalties and Sentences
Rules and Regulations
Time
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous