MD SB135 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-10 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-10 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the Department of the Environment from taking an administrative action to enforce specified watershed protection and restoration program requirements or imposing a penalty for a violation of specified provisions of law or regulations before July 1, 2015.
Title
Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - Enforcement by Department of the Environment - Moratorium
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-10 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-09 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |