MD SB134 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB85
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-12 - Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-12 - Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the governing body of a county or of a municipal corporation to grant a tax credit against the property tax imposed on the dwelling house of certain disabled veterans; establishing a tax credit against the State property tax on the dwelling house of certain disabled veterans; providing for the calculation of the credit; requiring certain disabled veterans to provide certain documents when applying for the credits under the Act; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2023.
Title
Property Tax Credit for Disabled Veterans - Established
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-12 | Senate | Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m. |
2023-01-12 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
SB85 (Carry Over) 2022-01-24 - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
HB1258 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-16 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1258 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-16 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Subjects
Armed Forces
Counties
Disabilities
Forms
Laws and Ordinances
Local Government Mandates
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Residency
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property
Veterans
Counties
Disabilities
Forms
Laws and Ordinances
Local Government Mandates
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Residency
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property
Veterans
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - Property | 9 | 112 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0134?ys=2023RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/bills/sb/sb0134f.pdf |