MD SB134 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB686
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "sexual abuse"; altering the statute of limitations in certain civil actions relating to child sexual abuse by providing that a certain action may be filed at any time; providing for the retroactive application of the Act to revive any action that was barred by the application of the period of limitations applicable before October 1, 2021, if the action is filed before October 1, 2023; and repealing a statute of repose for certain civil actions relating to child sexual abuse.
Title
Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse - Definition and Statute of Limitations
Sponsors
Sen. Shelly Hettleman [D] | Sen. Paul Corderman [R] | Sen. Sarah Elfreth [D] | Sen. Brian Feldman [D] |
Sen. Ronald Young [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2020-09-30 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB134 (Carry Over) 2020-12-28 - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
HB263 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-16 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
HB263 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-16 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Subjects
Civil Actions
Civil Actions and Procedures
Family Law
Obscenity
Pornography
Prostitution
Sexual Offenses
Statutes of Limitation
Civil Actions and Procedures
Family Law
Obscenity
Pornography
Prostitution
Sexual Offenses
Statutes of Limitation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Chapter of the Acts | 2017 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 5 | 117 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0134?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0134f.pdf |