MD SB134 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 165
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 165
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the salary of the Sheriff of Somerset County from not less than $60,000 to not less than $75,000; and providing for the application of the Act.
Title
Somerset County - Sheriff - Salary
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Mathias [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-06 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 165 |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2016-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2016-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-07 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2016-02-12 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m. |
2016-01-15 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |