MD SB133 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-08 - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-08 - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the 5-year limitation on the maximum duration that a tax exemption for specified manufacturing property in Somerset County may be granted; etc.
Title
Somerset County - Tax Exemption for Manufacturing Property - Duration
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Mathias [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-08 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-15 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Equipment
Exemptions
Industry and Technology
Personal Property
Property Tax
Real Property
Somerset County
Taxes - Property - Local
Exemptions
Industry and Technology
Personal Property
Property Tax
Real Property
Somerset County
Taxes - Property - Local