MD SB133 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting a manufacturer that distributes its own prescription devices that are approved or authorized by the U.S. Food and Drug Administration from specified permit requirements; altering the information required to be included in an application for a wholesale distributor permit; limiting a requirement that the State Board of Pharmacy or its designee conduct a specified inspection to apply only to applicants that hold prescription drugs or devices; etc.
Title
State Board of Pharmacy - Wholesale Distributor Permits - Permit and
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Conway [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | |
2012-03-30 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-30 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-03 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2012-03-14 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-05 | First Reading Health and Government Operations | |
2012-03-31 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-02 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2012-02-29 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-02-29 | Favorable with Amendments 624838/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-02-28 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-01-19 | Hearing 2/1 at 2:15 p.m. | |
2012-01-18 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Criminal Background Investigations
Drugs
Equipment
Fees
Fingerprinting
Health Occupations
Inspections
Interstate Affairs
Licenses
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Privacy
Criminal Background Investigations
Drugs
Equipment
Fees
Fingerprinting
Health Occupations
Inspections
Interstate Affairs
Licenses
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Privacy