MD SB132 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a nonresident pharmacy to have a pharmacist on staff who is licensed for providing specified services to patients; requiring a nonresident pharmacy to comply with requirements when dispensing prescription drugs or devices to a patient or otherwise engaging in the practice of pharmacy in Maryland; requiring that toll-free telephone service provided by a nonresident pharmacy facilitate communication between patients in Maryland and a pharmacist who is required to refer specified patients to a specified pharmacist; etc.
Title
Health Occupations - State Board of Pharmacy - Jurisdiction Over Nonresident
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Conway [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | |
2012-03-30 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-30 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-03 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2012-03-14 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-13 | First Reading Health and Government Operations | |
2012-03-31 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-12 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-03-08 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-08 | Favorable with Amendments 824439/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-07 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-01-19 | Hearing 2/1 at 2:15 p.m. | |
2012-01-18 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Discipline
Drugs
Equipment
Fines
Health Occupations
Inspections
Interstate Affairs
Investigations and Inquiries
Licenses
Nonresidents
Patients
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Privacy
Records
Reports
Telephones
Discipline
Drugs
Equipment
Fines
Health Occupations
Inspections
Interstate Affairs
Investigations and Inquiries
Licenses
Nonresidents
Patients
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Privacy
Records
Reports
Telephones