MD SB131 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 534
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Increasing the maximum civil penalty applicable to a violation for affixing a commercial sign to a State highway sign, signal, or marker in the State highway right-of-way to $100 per commercial sign affixed; and clarifying certain language establishing a civil penalty for a violation of the prohibition against placing or maintaining commercial signs in a State highway right-of-way.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Highways - Commercial Signs in Rights-of-Way - Penalties

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 534
2020-03-18SenateReturned Passed
2020-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (128-2)
2020-03-18HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-17HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-03-16HouseHearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-03-16HouseHearing canceled
2020-03-11HouseHearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-12HouseReferred Environment and Transportation
2020-02-11SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2020-02-07SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-02-07SenateFavorable with Amendments {417977/1 Adopted
2020-02-06SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2020-01-13SenateHearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
2020-01-10SenateHearing canceled
2020-01-10SenateReassigned to Finance
2020-01-09SenateHearing 1/21 at 2:00 p.m.
2020-01-09SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Transportation8605(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback