MD SB130 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 46
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 46
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the designation of a certain crime that a police officer may not charge by citation.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Charge by Citation - Violation of Condition of Release
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Lee [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 46 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2019-03-29 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-29 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-29 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2019-03-11 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-25 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Citations
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Minors
Pretrial Detention or Release
Sexual Offenses
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Minors
Pretrial Detention or Release
Sexual Offenses