MD SB13 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 161
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 161
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the circumstances under which a certified nursing assistant may renew the certificate to allow the nursing assistant to provide, under certain circumstances, certain evidence of completion of a certain nursing assistant training program or a certain refresher training program as required in certain regulations adopted by the State Board of Nursing; and requiring the Board to adopt certain regulations.
Title
Certified Nursing Assistants – Certificate Renewal – Training Program Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 161 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2021-04-07 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-07 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2021-03-20 | House | Hearing canceled |
2021-03-17 | House | Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-11 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-01-06 | Senate | Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-11-01 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB1193 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-22 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Certifications
Continuing Education
Evidence
Federal Government
Health Occupations
Job Training
Nursing Assistants
Rules and Regulations
Time
Certifications
Continuing Education
Evidence
Federal Government
Health Occupations
Job Training
Nursing Assistants
Rules and Regulations
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health Occupations | 8 | 6A-08 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |