MD SB13 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-30 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-30 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying that service in the Maryland Defense Force is voluntary and a member may be dismissed with cause at any time; altering the classes of State militia; repealing the requirement that a specified individual take a specified oath; repealing specified authorization and requirements relating to organizational commanders; prohibiting the Maryland Defense Force or its members from accepting gifts, donations, gratuities, or anything of value in exchange for a service rendered; etc.
Title
Public Safety - State Militia
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-2) (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-17 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-2) |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Floor Amendment {903829/1 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Special Order until 3/15 (Senator Waugh) Adopted |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Special Order until later today (Senator Miller) Adopted |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Favorable |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-11 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-09-30 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Armed Forces
Awards, Medals and Prizes
Fees
Gifts
Military Department
Public Safety
Retirement Systems
Rules and Regulations
Workers' Compensation
Awards, Medals and Prizes
Fees
Gifts
Military Department
Public Safety
Retirement Systems
Rules and Regulations
Workers' Compensation