MD SB128 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB338
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring an animal control facility operated by a county or municipality to waive the adoption fee for a dog or cat for a veteran who presents a valid driver's license or identification card that includes a notation of veteran status; authorizing an animal control facility to limit the number of adoption fee waivers granted to an individual under the Act to one dog and one cat within a 6-month period; and applying the Act to all counties and municipalities.
Title
Local Government – Animal Control Facilities – Adoption Fee Waiver for Veterans
(Pets for Vets Act of 2020)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-13 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-16 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {724836/1 Adopted |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-09 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
SB128 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Adoption - see also- Parents and Guardians
Animal Shelters
Animals
Counties
Dogs
Drivers' Licenses
Fees
Identification
Local Government - Generally
Municipal Corporations
Time
Veterans
Animal Shelters
Animals
Counties
Dogs
Drivers' Licenses
Fees
Identification
Local Government - Generally
Municipal Corporations
Time
Veterans
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Local Government | 1 | 1314 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |