MD SB128 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 53
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 53
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a specified provision of law that prohibits a person from keeping for sale any unfrozen crab meat, any frozen crab meat, or any pasteurized crab meat at temperatures that exceed specified maximum temperatures.
Title
Public Health - Required Temperatures for Sale of Crab Meat - Repeal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 53 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-03-28 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2017-03-24 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-24 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-24 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2017-03-21 | House | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-16 | Senate | First Reading Finance |