MD SB125 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 352
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 352
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the seller of residential real property located within 1 mile of a National Priorities List (NPL) Superfund site to include a certain addendum, written in conspicuous type, to the contract for the sale of the property; requiring the addendum to provide notice that within 5 days after signing and dating the contract of sale and on written notice to the seller, the buyer may void the contract and is eligible to receive a full refund of any money paid to the seller; etc.
Title
Residential Property Sales - Contract Disclosures - Superfund Sites
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 127 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 127 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 352 |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2024-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (127-7) |
2024-04-01 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-04-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments {733921/1 Adopted |
2024-04-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2024-03-21 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-08 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Floor Amendment {873126/1 (Senator Smith) Adopted |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Floor Amendment {783229/1 (Senator Lewis Young) Withdrawn |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 3/5 (Senator Smith) Adopted |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Floor Amendment {783229/1 (Senator Lewis Young) |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Floor Amendment {283326/1 (Senator Lewis Young) Withdrawn |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Smith) Adopted |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Floor Amendment {283326/1 (Senator Lewis Young) |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 3/1 (Senator Jennings) Adopted |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Floor Amendment {283326/1 (Senator Lewis Young) |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Adopted |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 2/29 (Senator Lewis Young) Adopted |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {653126/1 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2024-01-15 | Senate | Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2023-08-02 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB486 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 351
Subjects
Boundaries
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Disclosure
Electronic Government
Environmental Health
Federal Government
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Notices
Pollution
Real Property
Residential Property
Security Deposits
Standards and Best Practices
Time
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Disclosure
Electronic Government
Environmental Health
Federal Government
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Notices
Pollution
Real Property
Residential Property
Security Deposits
Standards and Best Practices
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Real Property | 10 | 714 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |