MD SB125 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 122
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 122
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Continuing the State Board of Chiropractic Examiners in accordance with the provisions of the Maryland Program Evaluation Act (sunset law) by extending to July 1, 2032, the termination provisions relating to the statutory and regulatory authority of the Board.
Title
State Board of Chiropractic Examiners - Sunset Extension
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 122 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2021-04-02 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-31 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2021-03-17 | House | Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-12-29 | Senate | Hearing 1/19 at 2:00 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-09-26 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health Occupations | 3 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 3 | 602 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |