MD SB124 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-24 - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-24 - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Medical Assistance Program and certain health insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations to provide coverage and certain reimbursement for annual behavioral health wellness visits.
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Health Insurance - Annual Behavioral Health Wellness Visits - Coverage and Reimbursement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-24 | Senate | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2023-10-04 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB400 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-26 - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Health
Health - Insurance
Health Care Facilities
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Health Occupations
Hospitals
Medical Assistance
Medical Testing and Diagnosis
Mental and Behavioral Health
Nonprofit Organizations
Public Health
Reimbursement Rates
Time
Health - Insurance
Health Care Facilities
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Health Occupations
Hospitals
Medical Assistance
Medical Testing and Diagnosis
Mental and Behavioral Health
Nonprofit Organizations
Public Health
Reimbursement Rates
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 15 | 102.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 15 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 15 | 861 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0124?ys=2024RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2024RS/bills/sb/sb0124f.pdf |