MD SB124 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 466
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 466
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the name of the Courthouse Dog and Child Witness Pilot Program in the circuit courts for Anne Arundel County and Harford County to be the Court Dog and Child Witness Pilot Program; extending to September 30, 2021, the date by which the Administrative Office of the Courts is required to provide a report on the operation and results of the pilot program to the General Assembly; and extending to September 30, 2021, the termination date of the pilot program.
Title
Anne Arundel County and Harford County - Court Dog and Child Witness Pilot Program - Extension
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 466 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2019-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2019-03-18 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Administrative Office of the Courts
Anne Arundel County
Circuit Courts
Courts and Court Personnel - Local
Dogs
Harford County
Minors
Names
Reports
Sunset
Witnesses
Anne Arundel County
Circuit Courts
Courts and Court Personnel - Local
Dogs
Harford County
Minors
Names
Reports
Sunset
Witnesses