MD SB124 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a licensed physical therapist to certify specified medical conditions of an applicant for a special disability registration number and special disability registration plates and for specified parking placards; requiring the State Board of Physical Therapy Examiners to be responsible for the development and maintenance of a database system with which the Motor Vehicle Administration can interface and verify licensure; etc.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates and Parking Placards for Individuals With Disabilities - Licensed Physical Therapists
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-1) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2015-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-1) |
2015-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-07 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-06 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2015-03-26 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-20 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Disabilities
Electronic Government
Health
Health Occupations
License Plates
Motor Vehicle Registration
Parking
Physical Therapists
Records
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Disabilities
Electronic Government
Health
Health Occupations
License Plates
Motor Vehicle Registration
Parking
Physical Therapists
Records
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration