MD SB124 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that the POW/MIA flag and a flag to honor and remember members of the armed forces who died in the line of duty be flown on the State House grounds on specified days each year; adding Armed Forces Day and Independence Day to the days on which the POW/MIA flag is to be flown on the State House grounds; requiring the State House Trust to determine the site on the State House grounds where a specified flag will be flown; etc.
Title
Flag Display on State House Grounds - POW/MIA Flag and a Flag to Honor and
Sponsors
Sen. John Astle [D] | Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Sen. Joan Conway [D] | Sen. Roy Dyson [D] |
Sen. William Ferguson [D] | Sen. J.B. Jennings [R] | Sen. Karen Montgomery [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-25 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-25 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-09 | Third Reading Passed (139-0) | |
2011-04-09 | Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2011-04-08 | Delegates Tarrant, Kipke, and Oaks | |
2011-04-08 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2011-04-08 | House Refuses to Recede | |
2011-04-04 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0) | |
2011-04-03 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-03 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-04-07 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2011-03-16 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-28 | First Reading Health and Government Operations | |
2011-04-09 | Passed Enrolled | |
2011-04-08 | Third Reading Passed (44-0) | |
2011-04-08 | Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2011-04-05 | Senators Reilly, Young, and Montgomery | |
2011-04-05 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2011-04-05 | Senate Requests House Recede | |
2011-04-05 | Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments | |
2011-02-25 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-02-22 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-02-22 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-02-21 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-01-26 | Hearing 2/9 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-01-24 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |