MD SB122 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-06 - Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-06 - Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering certain terms relating to eligibility for benefits under the More Jobs for Marylanders and Opportunity Zone Enhancement programs; altering, to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2018, but before January 1, 2022, the time for which enhancements under the Opportunity Zone Enhancement Program are applicable; limiting eligibility for certain Opportunity Zone Enhancement Program benefits to investments in biotechnology and cybersecurity companies established in opportunity zones by March 1, 2018; etc.
Title
Economic Development - Opportunity Zone Incentives - Alteration of the More Jobs for Marylanders and Opportunity Zone Enhancement Programs
Sponsors
Sen. Cory McCray [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-06 | Senate | Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-08 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2019-11-01 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB45 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 38
Subjects
Bail
Bonds
Commerce and Business
Commerce, Department of
Counties
Country Clubs
Cybersecurity
Data
Economic and Community Development
Electronic Communication
Enterprise Zones
Environmental Matters
Equipment
Food
Health
Housing
Industry and Technology
Massage
Minorities
Revenue and Taxes
Taxes - Income
Taxes - Property
Time
Women
Work, Labor and Employment
Bonds
Commerce and Business
Commerce, Department of
Counties
Country Clubs
Cybersecurity
Data
Economic and Community Development
Electronic Communication
Enterprise Zones
Environmental Matters
Equipment
Food
Health
Housing
Industry and Technology
Massage
Minorities
Revenue and Taxes
Taxes - Income
Taxes - Property
Time
Women
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Economic Development | 6 | 1001 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 6 | 1002 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 6 | 1006 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 6 | 1007 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 6 | 801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - Property | 9 | 110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0122?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/sb/sb0122f.pdf |