MD SB121 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-14 - Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the purpose and use of the Maryland Farms and Families Fund; establishing the Maryland Food and Agricultural Resiliency Mechanism Grant Program and Fund to provide grants to food banks and charitable emergency food providers to alleviate food insecurity; and establishing the Maryland Farm-to-School Meal Grant Pilot Program and Fund to award grants to eligible school districts that include a local food component in school meals and to incentivize the production, procurement, and provision of local foods in school meals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Farms and Families Fund, Maryland Food and Agricultural Resiliency Mechanism Grant Program, and Maryland Farm-to-School Meal Grant Pilot Program - Alterations and Establishment

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-14SenateHearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m.
2022-01-12SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-10-29SenatePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

HB147 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-10 - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Agriculture102001(n/a)See Bill Text
Agriculture102002(n/a)See Bill Text
Agriculture102003(n/a)See Bill Text
Agriculture102004(n/a)See Bill Text
Agriculture102101(n/a)See Bill Text
Agriculture102102(n/a)See Bill Text
Agriculture102103(n/a)See Bill Text
Education9.11101(n/a)See Bill Text
Education9.11102(n/a)See Bill Text
Education9.11103(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback