MD SB1206 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on May 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-26 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 854
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on May 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-26 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 854
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Governor to include in the annual State budget, for fiscal years 2020 through 2023, an appropriation of $500,000 from the Transportation Trust Fund for the operation of the replica sailing vessel known as the Pride of Baltimore II; requiring any person or entity receiving funds under the Act to submit a certain report to the Department of Transportation and certain committees of the General Assembly by December 1, 2019; etc.
Title
Transportation – Pride of Baltimore II – Funding and Reporting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (111-22) (Y: 112 N: 23 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (111-22) (Y: 112 N: 23 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-26 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 854 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2018-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (111-22) |
2018-04-04 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments {304962/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2018-03-28 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-20 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {949539/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Hearing 3/08 at 2:00 p.m. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Hearing 3/08 at 2:15 p.m. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2018-02-23 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Appropriations
Boats and Ships
Budgets
Historical Matters
Monuments and Memorials
Operating Budget
Revenue and Taxes
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Boats and Ships
Budgets
Historical Matters
Monuments and Memorials
Operating Budget
Revenue and Taxes
Transportation
Transportation - Generally