MD SB1200 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - Referred Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - Referred Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Making it an unfair or deceptive trade practice under the Maryland Consumer Protection Act for an Internet service provider to sell or transfer for marketing purposes a consumer's personally identifying information without the consumer's express and affirmative permission; requiring the Joint Committee on Cybersecurity, Information Technology, and Biotechnology to monitor the enforcement and impact of provisions of the Act on consumers, Internet service providers, and other businesses in the State; requiring a specified report; etc.
Title
Internet Consumer Privacy Rights Act of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - House - House Floor - Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Delegate Frick) Adopted (116-18) (Y: 116 N: 18 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (34-13) (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted (33-14) (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted (33-14) (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (34-13) (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted (33-14) (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted (33-14) (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2017-04-10 | House | Motion Rules Suspended Referred (Delegate Frick) Adopted (116-18) |
2017-04-10 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (34-13) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Floor Committee Amendment {307576/1 Adopted |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Special Order until 4/10 (Senator Middleton) Adopted |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment {397075/1 Adopted |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspended Referred (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted |
2017-04-04 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Advertising
Attorney General
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Committees and Commissions
Consumer Protection
Discrimination
Electronic Commerce
Electronic Communication
Emergency Bills
Identification
Penalties and Sentences
Privacy
Unfair Trade Practices
Attorney General
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Committees and Commissions
Consumer Protection
Discrimination
Electronic Commerce
Electronic Communication
Emergency Bills
Identification
Penalties and Sentences
Privacy
Unfair Trade Practices