MD SB120 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-26 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 850
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-26 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 850
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a court to decree an absolute divorce on the grounds of mutual consent if the parties have minor children, under certain circumstances; requiring a certain settlement agreement to provide for the care, custody, access, and support of minor or dependent children; requiring certain parties to attach a completed child support guidelines worksheet to a certain settlement agreement; etc.
Title
Family Law - Divorce on Grounds of Mutual Consent - Parties With Minor Children
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (99-33) (Y: 100 N: 34 NV: 6 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (33-14) (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (33-14) (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-26 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 850 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (99-33) |
2018-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-05 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2018-03-27 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-02 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (33-14) |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Special Order until 2/1 (Senator Serafini) Adopted |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Special Order until 1/29 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Favorable |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-11 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |