MD SB12 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-14 - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Hearing: Jan 25 @ 1:00 pm Senate Finance Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Maryland Department of Health to require that proposals requesting Behavioral Health Crisis Response Grant Program funding contain response standards that minimize law enforcement interaction for individuals in crisis; altering the definition of "mobile crisis team" to include prioritizing limiting interaction of law enforcement with individuals in crisis; and requiring each public safety answering point to develop a written policy for calls involving an individual suffering an active mental health crisis.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Behavioral Health Crisis Response Services and Public Safety Answering Points – Modifications

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-14SenateHearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
2022-01-12SenateFirst Reading Finance
2021-10-29SenatePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

HB129 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-18 - Hearing 1/26 at 2:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health - General101401(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General5208(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety1304(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback