MD SB12 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-31 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-31 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Maryland Quiet Vehicles and Pedestrian Safety Advisory Committee; providing for the membership, duties, and staffing of the Advisory Committee; prohibiting a member of the Advisory Committee from receiving compensation or reimbursement for expenses; requiring the Advisory Committee to report by June 30, 2013, on findings and recommendations regarding the minimum sound level and sound characteristics to be required for all new vehicles sold and registered in the State; etc.
Title
Maryland Quiet Vehicles and Pedestrian Safety Advisory Committee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-31 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0) | |
2011-03-30 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-30 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-04-01 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters | |
2011-03-22 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-17 | First Reading Environmental Matters | |
2011-03-17 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2011-03-15 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-15 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-14 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-01-14 | Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-01-14 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Blind Persons
Committees and Commissions
Hearings
Motor Vehicles
Noise
Pedestrians
Reports
Safety
Sunset
Transportation, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Hearings
Motor Vehicles
Noise
Pedestrians
Reports
Safety
Sunset
Transportation, Department of