MD SB1191 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 732
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 732
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Maryland Center for School Safety to make grants for specified security-related projects to schools and child care centers determined to be at risk of specified hate crimes or attacks; authorizing specified schools or child care centers to apply to the Center for a specified State grant; establishing the terms and conditions for the use of specified State grant funds by specified recipients; etc.
Title
Schools and Child Care Centers - State Grant Program - Security Upgrades for Facilities at Risk of Hate Crimes or Attacks
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (141-0) (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-1) (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-1) (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 732 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (141-0) |
2017-04-08 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-08 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-08 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2017-04-05 | House | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-04-04 | House | Rereferred to Ways and Means |
2017-03-31 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-1) |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {344233/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Referred Senate Rules |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Manno) Adopted |
2017-03-15 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Appropriations
Child Care
Children
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, State Board of
Grants
Harassment
Human Relations
Private Schools
Public Safety
Religion
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Violence
Child Care
Children
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, State Board of
Grants
Harassment
Human Relations
Private Schools
Public Safety
Religion
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Violence