MD SB118 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-04 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing that the Secretary of State Police is not required to submit certain fingerprints with a certain application for a criminal history records check if the applicant's fingerprints are already on file with the Department of State Police.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Handgun Permits - Criminal History Records Checks - Fingerprint Submission Exception

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-04SenateUnfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
2019-01-29SenateHearing canceled
2019-01-25SenateHearing 2/05 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-01-17SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback