MD SB1177 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 497
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 497
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing in Harford County a provision of law stating that a condition of a common direct or indirect sharing between specified persons of profit from the sale of alcoholic beverages gives rise to a presumption of indirect ownership interest in an alcoholic beverages license.
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Common Direct or Indirect Sharing of Profit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (112-0) (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 28 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 497 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (112-0) |
2017-04-08 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-08 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-08 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2017-04-04 | House | Rereferred to Economic Matters |
2017-03-30 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Floor Amendment {713925/1 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Special Order until 3/28 (Senator Jennings) Adopted |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Favorable |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-06 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Harford County
Interest
Leases and Rent
Retail Sales
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Harford County
Interest
Leases and Rent
Retail Sales