MD SB1169 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 733
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 733
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Secretary of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation to waive the charge of benefits against the earned rating record of an employing unit if the benefits are paid to a claimant during a specified period of unemployment because the employing unit shut down due to a natural disaster and the Governor declared a state of emergency due to the natural disaster; and providing that the waiver may be in effect only for a specified period.
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Charge of Benefits - Waiver Due to Natural Disaster
Sponsors
Sen. Gail Bates [R] | Sen. Thomas Middleton [D] | Sen. John Astle [D] | Sen. Joanne Benson [D] |
Sen. Brian Feldman [D] | Sen. Stephen Hershey [R] | Sen. J.B. Jennings [R] | Sen. Katherine Klausmeier [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 733 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2017-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-07 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-07 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2017-04-06 | House | Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-04-04 | House | Rereferred to Economic Matters |
2017-03-27 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {597873/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2017-03-03 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Claims
Committees and Commissions
Emergencies
Governor
Insurance
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Records
Salaries and Compensation
Time
Unemployment
Unemployment Insurance
Work, Labor and Employment
Claims
Committees and Commissions
Emergencies
Governor
Insurance
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Records
Salaries and Compensation
Time
Unemployment
Unemployment Insurance
Work, Labor and Employment