MD SB1168 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-21 - Hearing canceled
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-21 - Hearing canceled
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the age of an individual to whom a pharmacist may administer an influenza vaccination from at least 9 years old to at least 5 years old.
Title
Pharmacists - Administration of the Influenza Vaccination - Age Requirement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-21 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-03 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |