MD SB1162 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 421
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 421
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the exemption of the Washington County Superintendent of Schools and the Washington County Board of Education from certain requirements that relate to the appointment and reappointment of the Superintendent.
Title
Washington County - Superintendent of Schools - Appointment and Reappointment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-1) (Y: 138 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 421 |
2017-12-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-1) |
2018-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-07 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-06 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2018-03-29 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-20 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-19 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Exemptions
Public Officials
School Administration
Washington County
Education, Boards of
Exemptions
Public Officials
School Administration
Washington County