MD SB116 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB210
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 200
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 200
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a prohibition on judges of the orphans' court acting as attorneys to prohibit a judge of the orphans' court from acting as an attorney in matters related to the administration of an estate or a guardianship of a minor within the jurisdiction of the court in any county or Baltimore City, or the preparation of an estate plan or estate planning documents that might come within the jurisdiction of the court in any county or Baltimore City following the death of any individual.
Title
Orphans' Court Judges - Restriction on Practicing Law
Sponsors
Sen. Chris West [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-29 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 200 |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2024-03-29 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2024-03-28 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-28 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2024-03-28 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2024-02-09 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Hearing 1/11 at 2:30 p.m. |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Hearing 1/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2023-09-29 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB210 (Carry Over) 2023-03-22 - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
HB528 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 201
HB528 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 201
Subjects
Attorneys
Baltimore City
Counties
Courts
Estates and Trusts
Judges
Minors
Orphans' Court
Parents and Guardians
Baltimore City
Counties
Courts
Estates and Trusts
Judges
Minors
Orphans' Court
Parents and Guardians
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Estates and Trusts | 2 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Estates and Trusts | 2 | 109 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |