MD SB116 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-21 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-21 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring 20% of certain State aid to be discontinued if a county, municipality, or special taxing district does not submit a certain audit report within 1 calendar year of a certain deadline for the report, subject to a certain condition; altering the municipal corporation tax rate applicable to business personal property and certain operating real property to be not more than a certain amount; and requiring the City of Seat Pleasant to hire a certain entity to perform a certain audit and submit the report by January 1, 2024.
Title
Property Tax - Municipal Corporation Business Personal Property Tax Rate and Local Government Reporting Requirements - Alterations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-21 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-20 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Floor Amendment {883523/1 (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {913121/1 Adopted |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m. |
2023-01-11 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2022-11-14 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB450 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-01 - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Auditors and Audits
Commerce and Business
Comptroller
Legislative Services, Department of
Local Government Mandates
Municipal Corporations
Personal Property
Property Tax
Real Property
Reports
Special Tax Districts
State Aid
Taxes - Property
Taxes - Property - Local
Commerce and Business
Comptroller
Legislative Services, Department of
Local Government Mandates
Municipal Corporations
Personal Property
Property Tax
Real Property
Reports
Special Tax Districts
State Aid
Taxes - Property
Taxes - Property - Local
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Local Government | 16 | 304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Local Government | 16 | 306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - Property | 6 | 303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |