MD SB115 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-20 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-20 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a requirement that a transfer of a minimum security inmate from a State correctional facility to a local correctional facility be for participation in community-oriented correctional programs; and authorizing the Secretary of Public Safety and Correctional Services to make a specified transfer.
Title
Correctional Services - Minimum Security Inmates - Transfer to Local Correctional Facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-20 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-08 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2013-11-06 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Correctional Institutions
Prisoners
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Prisoners
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of