MD SB1149 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 785
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 785
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Transit Administration to provide ridership on transit vehicles to eligible students in Baltimore City public schools between the hours of 5 a.m. and 8 p.m. only for school-related activities; prohibiting the Administration from collecting any fees for the services; requiring Baltimore City and the Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners to submit a report to the Governor and General Assembly by December 1, 2018, on the school system's financial condition and the impact of the transportation services provided; etc.
Title
Baltimore City - Maryland Transit Administration - Transit Services for Public School Students
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (87-49) (Y: 87 N: 49 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-01 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {663629/1 (Delegate Rey) Rejected (50-85) (Y: 50 N: 85 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (31-15) (Y: 31 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {863425/1 (Senator Middleton) Adopted (32-13) (Y: 32 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-01 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {663629/1 (Delegate Rey) Rejected (50-85) (Y: 50 N: 85 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (31-15) (Y: 31 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {863425/1 (Senator Middleton) Adopted (32-13) (Y: 32 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-27 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 785 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (87-49) |
2017-04-08 | House | Floor Amendment {663629/1 (Delegate Rey) Rejected (50-85) |
2017-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-07 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-07 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2017-04-05 | House | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-04-04 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2017-03-30 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (31-15) |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Floor Amendment {163527/1 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Floor Amendment {863425/1 (Senator Middleton) Adopted (32-13) |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Special Order until 3/29 (Senator Middleton) Adopted |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Floor Amendment {863425/1 (Senator Middleton) |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Special Order until later today (Senator Hershey) Adopted |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Floor Amendment {863425/1 (Senator Middleton) |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {937078/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2017-02-27 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Baltimore City
Fees
Mass Transit
Public Schools
Reports
Rules and Regulations
State Employees
Students
Sunset
Transportation - Generally
Transportation, Department of
Fees
Mass Transit
Public Schools
Reports
Rules and Regulations
State Employees
Students
Sunset
Transportation - Generally
Transportation, Department of