MD SB1142 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-18 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-18 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the McArdle Early Intervention Scholarship Program in the State Department of Education; providing that the purpose of the program is to establish intervention services for and to improve the education outcomes of young students with disabilities under specified circumstances; establishing eligibility requirements for students to participate in the Program; requiring the Department to verify the eligibility of specified students who apply for the Program within 10 days after receipt of a specified application; etc.
Title
State Department of Education - McArdle Early Intervention Scholarship Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-18 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-02 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Appeals
Assessments
Counties
Criminal Background Investigations
Developmental Disabilities
Disabilities
Education
Education, State Department of
Fees
Fingerprinting
Fraud
Hearings
Inspections
Notices
Postal Service
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Public Information
Public Schools
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Students
Subpoenas
Witnesses
Assessments
Counties
Criminal Background Investigations
Developmental Disabilities
Disabilities
Education
Education, State Department of
Fees
Fingerprinting
Fraud
Hearings
Inspections
Notices
Postal Service
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Public Information
Public Schools
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Students
Subpoenas
Witnesses