MD SB1140 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 242
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 242
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing in Wicomico County a Class B Youth and Civic Center license; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners to issue the license to a designee of the County Executive for use by a specified youth and civic center; requiring a specified youth and civic center to maintain a kitchen, dining space, and meeting space during the term of the license; authorizing a holder of the license to sell beer, wine, and liquor for on-premises consumption to individuals attending a youth and civic center event; etc.
Title
Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Youth and Civic Center License
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 242 |
2016-04-09 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2016-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2016-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-07 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-07 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2016-03-29 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-21 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-02 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Community Facilities and Services
County Executives
Fees
Food
License Commissioners, Boards of
Revenue and Taxes
Wicomico County
Youth
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Community Facilities and Services
County Executives
Fees
Food
License Commissioners, Boards of
Revenue and Taxes
Wicomico County
Youth