MD SB114 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB687
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 620
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 620
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a person to file a certain petition for expungement if the person is convicted of a certain misdemeanor involving driving while the person's license or privilege to drive is canceled, suspended, refused, or revoked; and providing that a person is subject to a certain enhanced penalty for a subsequent conviction for driving while the person's license or privilege to drive is canceled, suspended, refused, or revoked only in a certain circumstance.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Conviction and Subsequent Offender Penalties - Driving While Privilege Is Canceled, Suspended, Refused, or Revoked
Sponsors
Sen. Cory McCray [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 126 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 620 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (126-12) |
2021-04-07 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-07 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2021-03-23 | House | Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-03-16 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {108275/1 Adopted |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-12-28 | Senate | Hearing 1/19 at 11:00 a.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB687 (Carry Over) 2020-03-15 - Referred Judiciary
Subjects
Criminal Law - Procedure
Drivers' Licenses
Expungement
Fines
Motor Vehicle Operation
Penalties and Sentences
Petitions
Repeat Offenders
Drivers' Licenses
Expungement
Fines
Motor Vehicle Operation
Penalties and Sentences
Petitions
Repeat Offenders
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Procedure | 10 | 110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |