MD SB113 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-28 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-28 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the fine from $25 to $75 for a failure to secure a child in a child safety seat or seat belt while transporting the child in a motor vehicle.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Child Safety Seats and Seat Belts - Penalty
Sponsors
Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Sen. James DeGrange [D] | Sen. Jennie Forehand [D] | Sen. Robert Garagiola [D] |
Sen. Nancy King [D] | Sen. Karen Montgomery [D] | Sen. Douglas Peters [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-28 | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings Withdrawn | |
2011-02-17 | Hearing cancelled | |
2011-02-09 | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-01-28 | Hearing cancelled | |
2011-01-26 | Hearing 2/1 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-01-21 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2011rs/billfile/SB0113.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2011rs/bills/sb/sb0113f.pdf |