MD SB1127 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 848
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 848
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the membership of the Board of Trustees of the Baltimore City Community College; requiring the chair of the Board to be appointed by the President of the Senate and the Speaker of the House of Delegates; requiring the Board to analyze programs, priorities, student needs, budgetary projections, staffing, information technology requirements, the status of real estate holdings, and the efficiency of the College's operations; prohibiting the Board from appointing a new President of the College except under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Baltimore City Community College - Realignment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-27 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 848 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2017-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-06 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-06 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2017-04-05 | House | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-04-04 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2017-03-31 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Floor Amendment {283724/1 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {394736/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-02-22 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Annotated Code of Maryland
Baltimore City
Committees and Commissions
Community Colleges
Emergency Bills
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Job Training
Legislative Services, Department of
Names
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Baltimore City
Committees and Commissions
Community Colleges
Emergency Bills
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Job Training
Legislative Services, Department of
Names
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Telecommunications and Information Technology