MD SB1122 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-2)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor, assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 357
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution to limit the uses of certain revenues to educational opportunities and programs for the children of the State in public schools, the advancement of educators, and the construction of school facilities; requiring the Governor to include in the budget submission certain amounts in certain fiscal years as supplemental funding for certain purposes; requiring that certain funding be in addition to certain State funding provided for certain grades in public schools; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education – Commercial Gaming Revenues – Constitutional Amendment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-2) (Y: 131 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {253225/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (52-82) (Y: 53 N: 83 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {263226/1 (Senator Bates) Rejected (16-29) (Y: 17 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08SenateApproved by the Governor, assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 357
2018-04-09SenateReturned Passed
2018-04-06HouseThird Reading Passed (130-2)
2018-04-06HouseSecond Reading Passed
2018-04-06HouseFloor Amendment {253225/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (52-82)
2018-04-06HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2018-04-06HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2018-03-29HouseHearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
2018-03-20HouseFirst Reading Appropriations and Ways and Means
2018-03-19SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2018-03-15SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-15SenateFloor Amendment {263226/1 (Senator Bates) Rejected (16-29)
2018-03-15SenateFloor Amendment {713425/1 (Senator Madaleno) Adopted
2018-03-14SenateSpecial Order until 3/15 (Senator Hershey) Adopted
2018-03-14SenateFavorable with Amendments {869430/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-14SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2018-03-08SenateHearing 3/08 at 2:00 p.m.
2018-03-07SenateHearing canceled
2018-03-08SenateHearing 3/08 at 2:15 p.m.
2018-03-06SenateHearing canceled
2018-03-09SenateHearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-15SenateRereferred to Budget and Taxation
2018-02-15SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb1122&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb1122f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb1122t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_357_sb1122t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0002/sb1122_86943001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0002/sb1122_26322601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0002/sb1122_71342501.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0002/sb1122_25322501.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0002/sb1122.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/sb1122_b&t.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0568.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0639.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/sb1122_app.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1156.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1271.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback