MD SB1104 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-23 - Recommitted to Finance (Senator Klausmeier)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-23 - Recommitted to Finance (Senator Klausmeier)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Defining "qualified distressed county" for purposes of expanding eligibility for certain credits and benefits under the More Jobs for Marylanders Program to include certain geographic areas that share the same zip code as a qualified distressed county.
Title
Economic Development - More Jobs for Marylanders - Tier I Eligibility
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | Senate | Recommitted to Finance (Senator Klausmeier) |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2018-02-14 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Boundaries
Commerce and Business
Counties
Credit
Economic and Community Development
Taxes - Income
Taxes - Property
Time
Unemployment
Work, Labor and Employment
Commerce and Business
Counties
Credit
Economic and Community Development
Taxes - Income
Taxes - Property
Time
Unemployment
Work, Labor and Employment