MD SB110 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 662
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 662
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that an applicant for a license to practice podiatry pass the National Board of Podiatric Medical Examiners licensing examination and a written examination on the statute and regulations of the State Board of Podiatric Medical Examiners; repealing the requirement that the Board notify each qualified applicant of the time and place of the examination on the Board's statutes and regulations; requiring the Board to notify each qualified applicant of the requirements of the examination on the statutes and regulations; etc.
Title
State Board of Podiatric Medical Examiners – Licensure – Qualifications and Examinations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 662 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2018-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2018-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-25 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-09-27 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Examinations
Health Occupations
Licenses
Medical Examiners
Notices
Podiatrists
Records
Rules and Regulations
Health Occupations
Licenses
Medical Examiners
Notices
Podiatrists
Records
Rules and Regulations