MD SB11 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-11 - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-11 - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring specified State agencies that are deemed electronic voter registration agencies to implement electronic voter registration systems on or before July 1, 2017; requiring the State Board of Elections to promptly register individuals whose voter registration information is transmitted to the State Board through an electronic voter registration system; providing that information related to an applicant's decision not to register electronically to vote may only be used for the maintenance of registration statistics; etc.
Title
Freedom to Vote Act
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Manno [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {704735/1 Report Adopted |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-08-19 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Assessments
Attorney General
Committees and Commissions
Community Colleges
Community Facilities and Services
Counties
Crimes and Punishments
Disabilities
Disclosure
Elections
Elections, State Board of
Electronic Government
Federal Government
Forms
Health Benefit Exchange
Health Insurance
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Human Resources, Department of
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Licenses
Mental Health
Motor Vehicle Administration
Natural Resources, Department of
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Political Parties
Privacy
Records
Registration
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Signatures
State Universities and Colleges
Veterans Affairs, Department of
Voting
Assessments
Attorney General
Committees and Commissions
Community Colleges
Community Facilities and Services
Counties
Crimes and Punishments
Disabilities
Disclosure
Elections
Elections, State Board of
Electronic Government
Federal Government
Forms
Health Benefit Exchange
Health Insurance
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Human Resources, Department of
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Licenses
Mental Health
Motor Vehicle Administration
Natural Resources, Department of
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Political Parties
Privacy
Records
Registration
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Signatures
State Universities and Colleges
Veterans Affairs, Department of
Voting