MD SB11 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-26 - Hearing 4/3 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-26 - Hearing 4/3 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Director of the State Lottery Agency to issue to specified veterans' organizations a license for not more than five pull tab machines under specified circumstances; exempting specified counties from specified provisions; requiring a veterans' organization to locate and operate its pull tab machines at its principal meeting hall in the county in which the veterans' organization is located; authorizing the Director to adopt regulations; etc.
Title
State Lottery - Licenses - Veterans' Organizations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-26 | Hearing 4/3 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-01 | First Reading Ways and Means | |
2012-02-29 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2012-02-27 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-02-27 | Favorable with Amendments 709238/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-02-27 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2012-01-25 | Hearing 2/8 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-11 | First Reading Budget and Taxation | |
2011-09-08 | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Comptroller
Counties
Equipment
Gaming
Licenses
Lottery
Nonprofit Organizations
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Veterans
Comptroller
Counties
Equipment
Gaming
Licenses
Lottery
Nonprofit Organizations
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Veterans